Financial history MOULTON CHAPEL YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1095728
Charity reporting is overdue by 1659 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £16.66k £31.30k £31.30k £10.92k £6.24k
Total expenditure £3.88k £28.46k £28.46k £232.44k £5.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A