CAMEROON ASYLUM SUPPORT ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1093422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 16 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 16 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 13 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 14 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 14 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 03 October 2016 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 03 October 2016 33 days late Download