CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND

Charity number: 1089685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.62m £3.40m £4.09m £3.53m £4.35m
Total expenditure £3.20m £3.76m £4.51m £5.55m £5.15m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.10k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.47m £3.36m £4.04m £3.38m £4.24m
Income - Other trading activities £89.91k £27.06k £41.00k £43.00k £45.00k
Income - Charitable activities £13.72k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £45.09k £14.85k £11.00k £103.00k £64.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £4.16m £1.21m £1.98m £1.33m £2.30m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.59m £3.06m £3.32m £4.39m £4.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £611.44k £702.21k £1.19m £1.16m £923.00k
Expenditure - Governance £35.07k £0 £36.00k £15.00k £62.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £73.00k £103.00k £82.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0