Financial history Mountain Training United Kingdom & Ireland Ltd

Charity number: 1090203
Charity reporting is overdue by 148 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £324.82k £346.57k £411.58k £444.70k £448.72k
Total expenditure £350.67k £393.97k £405.01k £453.74k £478.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £73.08k £44.94k £66.00k N/A N/A