EAST SUSSEX FOSTER CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1092668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £28.14k £49.32k £69.87k £67.69k £56.21k
Total expenditure £30.48k £34.81k £52.99k £70.62k £51.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k