LIVERPOOL DIOCESAN PENSIONS FUND

Charity number: 1106692
Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 322 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 322 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 March 2020 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required