LIVERPOOL DIOCESAN PENSIONS FUND

Charity number: 1106692
Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £17.23k £23.21k £15.51k £24.70k £16.71k
Total expenditure £15.34k £21.91k £18.07k £19.11k £20.28k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A