Dogfen lywodraethu LEARNING DISABILITY ENGLAND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 JUN 2016 as amended on 11 May 2017 as amended on 28 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING, WORKSHOPS, TRAINING AND ADVOCACY IN RESPECT OF THEIR HOUSING CARE OR SUPPORT NEEDS
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.