Accounts and annual returns Leasingham St Andrew's PTFA

Charity number: 1093280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 07 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 January 2022 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 07 January 2022 586 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 07 January 2022 952 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1494 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1494 days