Financial history Leasingham St Andrew's PTFA

Charity number: 1093280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2009 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.33k £3.94k £4.25k £2.39k £3.27k
Total expenditure £1.47k £3.63k £4.40k £1.81k £1.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A