ST AGNES MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1095051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £16.69k £8.21k £15.95k £14.01k £17.94k
Total expenditure £10.41k £8.95k £12.75k £14.84k £10.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k