BOLTON WANDERERS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1090753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £778.36k £856.07k £821.38k £1.02m £816.17k
Total expenditure £701.54k £747.03k £844.57k £981.81k £934.54k
Income from government contracts £10.44k £16.00k £15.50k £9.14k £640
Income from government grants £14.37k £47.46k £27.64k £42.50k £86.33k
Income - Donations and legacies £512.60k £750.72k £664.31k £762.79k £564.12k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £265.76k £105.35k £157.07k £260.49k £252.05k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £701.54k £747.03k £841.46k £971.97k £929.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £3.11k £9.85k £4.82k
Expenditure - Governance £14.89k £24.51k £21.49k £14.85k £13.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0