GATEWAY INTO THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1093566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £228.32k £230.81k £360.15k £472.04k £567.77k
Total expenditure £222.64k £231.53k £313.02k £422.57k £473.27k
Income from government contracts £75.28k £83.22k £150.01k £247.18k £253.69k
Income from government grants £650 £6.76k £6.50k £19.04k £34.39k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.54k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £548.10k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £134
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £473.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £450
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0