LLANGEITHO FIRST RESPONSE

Charity number: 1092182
Charity reporting is overdue by 9 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £5.75k £0 £1.37k £100 £0
Total expenditure £4.45k £30 £1.90k £313 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A