Financial history LONDON COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Charity number: 1093358
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £133.64k £291.01k £396.37k £392.73k £469.32k
Total expenditure £132.88k £286.59k £385.72k £376.93k £458.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A