Dogfen lywodraethu Concerts for Craswall Trust
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 13 APRIL 2002 as amended on 12 Oct 2018 as amended on 13 Dec 2018 as amended on 29 Jan 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES; AND TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WITHIN THE PARISH OF CRASWALL, INCLUDING BY ASSISTING IN THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH CRASWALL AND OTHER PROPERTIES OWNED AND MANAGED BY THE CHURCH
Maes buddion
PARISH OF CRASWALL AND OTHER PROPERTIES OWNED AND MANAGED BY THE CHURCH
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.