THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY NURSERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1093347
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £211.52k £207.51k £302.03k £133.27k £113.62k
Total expenditure £193.01k £201.76k £337.32k £187.52k £141.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £48.23k £113.59k