KARIC FOUNDATION LONDON

Charity number: 1099172
Charity reporting is overdue by 601 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 601 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 601 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 04 April 2017 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required