Trustees CHARTERED MANAGEMENT INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1091035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Dawson | Chair | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Terry Corby | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Ogunjuyigbe | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sir Trevor Phillips | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Zealley | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Rhys Williams | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Allen | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim Stewart | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Box | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Lord Mark Price | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Grussing | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bob Cryan | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANN FRANCKE CCMI | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.