Financial history BRADFORD RAPE CRISIS AND SEXUAL ABUSE SURVIVORS SERVICE

Charity number: 1091732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £597.58k £558.27k £668.55k £568.11k £730.64k
Total expenditure £533.80k £638.14k £595.45k £575.99k £711.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £57.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £244.00k £442.07k £478.54k £478.54k £470.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £910 £447 £576 £1.64k £910
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £595.68k £556.57k £666.61k £565.11k £728.79k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £994 £1.26k £1.37k £1.36k £939
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £533.80k £638.14k £595.45k £575.99k £711.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.04k £1.90k £2.18k £2.15k £1.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0