CIRCUS ARTS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1097436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £31.23k £1.25k £188.38k £81.15k £7.82k
Total expenditure £38.13k £5.54k £13.03k £15.85k £38.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A