Accounts and annual returns HOLY REDEEMER ST MARK MISSION LIMITED

Charity number: 1094659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 September 2020 230 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 August 2019 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 February 2018 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required