CITY GATE COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1093245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £299.97k £316.44k £433.41k £538.16k £887.12k
Total expenditure £244.41k £259.68k £345.70k £432.49k £615.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £16.59k £191.19k
Income from government grants £43.06k £6.00k £14.80k £24.56k £192.44k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £419.24k £756.72k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £118.92k £130.16k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £4
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £241
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £414.93k £600.68k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £17.36k £14.01k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £9.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £197 £386