Trustees LONDON GAY MENS CHORUS (LGMC)
Charity number: 1092827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Gerard Brophy MBE | Chair | 17 June 2021 |
|
|||||
David Maurice Weitzmann | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Piers Alexander Jago DIXON | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Ian Clarke | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cameron John McLeod | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Edo Avraham | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Patrick Kaufman | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Sylvie Pierce MBE | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.