Financial history ZOE'S PLACE TRUST

Charity number: 1092545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £3.64m £4.03m £3.79m £3.86m £4.09m
Total expenditure £4.12m £4.17m £3.92m £2.78m £3.33m
Income from government contracts £519.03k £362.16k £230.80k £256.03k £372.29k
Income from government grants £534.24k £534.24k £719.23k £994.40k £751.27k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.80m £2.95m £3.09m £3.27m £3.24m
Income - Other trading activities £554.97k £654.19k £382.03k £207.95k £445.61k
Income - Charitable activities £519.03k £394.66k £256.03k £373.15k £397.71k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.36k £11.84k £9.46k £3.47k £3.69k
Income - Other £11.54k £19.77k £57.34k £6.73k £4.17k
Income - Legacies £322.43k £145.80k £94.62k £566.08k £735.34k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.12m £3.04m £3.13m £2.07m £2.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.01m £1.12m £793.99k £709.17k £904.01k
Expenditure - Governance £53.38k £302.63k £534.19k £318.47k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0