IDARA-E-TALEEM-O-AAGAHI PUBLIC TRUST UK. CENTRE FOR EDUCATION AND CONSCIOUSNESS

Charity number: 1093485
Charity reporting is overdue by 601 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £2.56k £12.56k £18.05k £13.44k £11.09k
Total expenditure £2.64k £12.67k £17.36k £12.42k £13.55k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A