Financial history ARCOLA THEATRE PRODUCTION COMPANY

Charity number: 1108613
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.12m £1.34m £1.35m £1.80m £1.75m
Total expenditure £1.14m £1.50m £1.51m £1.87m £2.04m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £301.74k £301.74k £11.40k £14.29k £316.74k
Income - Donations and legacies £418.60k £452.13k £421.15k £545.81k £550.72k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £690.86k £838.75k £896.99k £1.16m £1.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £14.43k £45.80k £31.24k £100.40k £90.53k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.14m £1.50m £1.48m £1.87m £2.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £37.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.00k £7.00k £7.50k £8.00k £8.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0