Accounts and annual returns THE CENTRE FOR GLOBAL STUDIES

Charity number: 1094442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window