Financial history THE CENTRE FOR GLOBAL STUDIES

Charity number: 1094442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £146.05k £197.86k £140.00k £50.00k £100.00k
Total expenditure £180.04k £152.52k £147.56k £67.90k £84.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A