Financial history SOUTH AND SOUTH EAST IN BLOOM

Charity number: 1092421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £48.23k £59.30k £59.31k £59.39k £24.82k
Total expenditure £48.04k £56.12k £55.66k £57.91k £33.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A