Accounts and annual returns WEST OF ENGLAND BAPTIST TRUST COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1092446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 March 2021 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required