Trustees IYIMV
Charity number: 1092322

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Cesar | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ruth Golden | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Winter | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Harvey Agar Ward | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giorgio Ambrosetti | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wainstein | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sidharth Punshi | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.