Financial history FRIENDS OF MARSHALLS PARK ACADEMY

Charity number: 1092858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.18k £1.95k £1.19k £12.28k £2
Total expenditure £613 £836 £766 £5.53k £12.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A