Trustees THE EDINGTON MUSIC FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1099266
Charity reporting is overdue by 60 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Andrew Wickens Trustee 19 August 2024
None on record
Billie Enfys Hylton Trustee 21 August 2023
None on record
Sophie Fleur Smith Trustee 21 August 2023
None on record
Robert James Quinney Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Tom Bennett Trustee 21 August 2018
None on record
WILLIAM THOMPSON-HARE Trustee 03 September 2012
None on record
SUE LOWERY Trustee 18 May 2011
None on record
JUSTIN LOWE Trustee 01 January 2000
None on record
PETER ROBERTS Trustee
None on record