InspireAll Leisure & Family Support Services

Charity number: 1093653

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Keating Trustee 24 July 2013 None on record
Alison Sinclair Trustee 20 October 2015 None on record
Nicholas David Ratcliffe Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
Christine Ayrton Trustee 20 October 2015 None on record
Colin Warne Chair 23 April 2013 None on record
Amanda Jacobson Trustee 12 June 2019
PLYMOUTH HEBREW CONGREGATION Received: On time
Kevin O'Malley Trustee 25 June 2013 None on record
MICHAEL GIBSON Trustee 04 January 2002 None on record
Ruth Anelena Huda Trustee 21 November 2018 None on record
Miranda Fleur Barnett Trustee 07 December 2016 None on record