COMPUTER FRIENDLY ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1096433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Lawrence Bourke Chair 17 December 2018 None on record
Ian Malcolm Herbert Williamson Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
Christopher Blandford Trustee 17 December 2018 None on record
Akhtar Zaman Trustee 15 September 2020
ISLAMIC CENTRE ST ALBANS (HERTS) Received: On time
ST ALBANS PAKISTAN WELFARE AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION Overdue by 604 days
RICHARD ROWLAND BRETT Trustee 01 May 2015
WHEATHAMPSTEAD U3A Overdue by 58 days
Nicholas John Rich Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
Jeremy Stuart Edbrook Trustee 26 June 2020 None on record
David Jerome Forbes Trustee 29 August 2017 None on record
Diana Mary Rhodes Trustee 11 March 2021 None on record
Carol Anne Elliott Trustee 01 June 2016 None on record
Alison Crossley Gibney Trustee 17 December 2018 None on record