THE MANNA HOUSE (TAMWORTH) CO

Charity number: 1093988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £469.75k £480.28k £496.40k £485.69k £472.24k
Total expenditure £436.40k £468.93k £476.64k £486.63k £413.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.50k N/A N/A £25.00k