Accounts and annual returns SIMEON CENTRE COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1098428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window