Financial history SIMEON CENTRE COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1098428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £60.70k £65.15k £80.27k £80.82k £75.76k
Total expenditure £55.52k £58.96k £69.15k £72.63k £66.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A