Trustees YORKSHIRE FILM ARCHIVE

Charity number: 1093468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLARE MORROW Chair 28 September 2016
None on record
Sally Anne Joynson Trustee 21 February 2022
None on record
Robert Leslie Hickey Trustee 12 December 2018
None on record
GRAEME THOMPSON Trustee 19 April 2017
THE CULTURAL SPRING
Received: On time
SUNDERLAND MUSIC, ARTS & CULTURE TRUST
Received: On time
CUSTOMS HOUSE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
DONALD CHARLES STEWART Trustee 05 August 2013
None on record
DALE GRAYSON Trustee 05 August 2013
None on record
PENELOPE WILKINSON Trustee 05 August 2013
None on record
MICHAEL HARVEY Trustee
None on record
TERRY SUTHERS Trustee
None on record