ST VIGOR AND ST JOHN PTFA

Charity number: 1093398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required