ANIMAL RESCUE AND CARE

Charity number: 1095004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 May 2020 93 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 November 2016 On time Download