ST. PETER'S CHILDREN'S CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1096305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download