HAFAL

Charity number: 1093747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.03m £5.46m £8.61m £7.84m £8.43m
Total expenditure £4.87m £5.43m £8.31m £7.98m £8.47m
Income from government contracts £4.71m £0 N/A N/A £2.61m
Income from government grants £202.33k £202.33k £202.33k N/A £2.61m
Income - Donations and legacies £288.52k £299.01k £927.38k £89.36k £82.48k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.71m £5.14m £7.68m £7.74m £8.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.30k £15.85k £393 £1.08k £848
Income - Other £6.00k £4.10k £3.25k £15.45k £16.51k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £3.47k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.83m £5.39m £8.25m £7.91m £8.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.07k £41.95k £56.83k £69.89k £53.11k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £19.45k £22.74k £24.41k £25.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0