Accounts and annual returns THE VIRGIN ISLANDS SEARCH AND RESCUE TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1098292
Charity reporting is overdue by 234 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 January 2022 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 January 2021 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 November 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required