Financial history THE VIRGIN ISLANDS SEARCH AND RESCUE TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1098292
Charity reporting is overdue by 226 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £0 £2.00k £24.00k £5 £5
Total expenditure £2.60k £3.65k £0 £24.47k £742
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A