Dogfen lywodraethu CHARD, ILMINSTER AND DISTRICT U3A
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 FEBRUARY 2002,AS AMENDED 19TH JULY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 16/03/2015 AS AMENDED ON 05 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 17 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 JAN 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT WHO ARE IN THEIR THIRD AGE (BEING THE PERIOD OF TIME AFTER THE FIRST AGE OF CHILDHOOD DEPENDENCE AND THE SECOND AGE OF FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT AND/OR PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY) RESIDING IN CHARD AND ILMINSTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Maes buddion
CHARD AND ITS SURROUNDINGS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.