Trustees THE ALBERT KENNEDY TRUST
Charity number: 1093815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Malcomson | Chair | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ed Tytherleigh | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bontle Senne | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Douglas | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Amy Prendergast | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yoni Ejo | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Haworth | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Collett | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Macmillan | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Dittmer | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Flynn | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.