Accounts and annual returns THE POTTERS HOUSE (MANCHESTER)

Charity number: 1093961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 July 2021 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 July 2021 268 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 March 2018 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 March 2018 140 days late Download Open in new window