Dogfen lywodraethu MOORSIDE HARVEST COMMUNITY CHURCH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 05/01/2003 AS AMENDED ON 14/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 07 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 OCT 2019 as amended on 13 Oct 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION, THROUGH: . THE WORSHIP OF GOD . THE TEACHING AND ESTABLISHING OF THE PEOPLE OF GOD IN THEIR FAITH, OUTLINED IN CLAUSE 9 ("THE STATEMENT OF DOCTRINE") . PRESENTATION OF THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST TO THE PEOPLES OF MOORSIDE, OLDHAM, UK . WORKING FOR GOD ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND BEYOND. 3.2 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MOORSIDE ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
MOORSIDE, OLDHAM, GREATER MANCHESTER.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.